Koenig, Marie-Charlotte (CPSO#: 63405)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Montreal, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Nov 1990 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2008