Koesser, Nicoleta (CPSO#: 84993)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Names: Kosser, Nicoleta (used until: 04 Jan 2015 )     Anca, Nicoleta (used until: 21 Dec 2014 )     Nutiu, Nicoleta (used until: 21 Oct 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Asklepios Klinik St.Georg
Department of Radiology
Lohmühlenstraße 5
Hamburg 20099
Germany
Phone: +4940181885439
Fax: +4940181885419

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Germany

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLETA KOESSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOESSER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2013