Koester, Catherine Louise (CPSO#: 84550)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 129
5 Earl Street
Newburgh ON  K0K 2S0
Phone: (613) 378-1754
Fax: (613) 378-1776
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kate Koester Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Koester ( CPSO# 84550 )

Business Address:
PO Box 129
5 Earl Street
Newburgh ON  K0K 2S0
Phone Number: (613) 378-1754

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE LOUISE KOESTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOESTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2008