Koffman, Allyson Enid (CPSO#: 71137)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Earl Bales Walk In Clinc
& Family Practice
100 4256 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M3H 5Y8
Phone: (647) 352-7188
Electoral District: 10

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 12 May 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2003
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2017
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2017
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Jan 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., August 15, 2017, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following term,
            condition and limitation is imposed on the certificate of registration held by
            Dr. Allyson Enid Koffman:

                  i)    At her own expense, Dr. Koffman shall participate in and
                        successfully complete, within 4 months of the date of this Order,
                        individualized instruction in medical ethics with an instructor
                        approved by the College.  The instructor shall provide a summative
                        report to the College including his or her conclusion about whether
                        the instruction was completed successfully by Dr. Koffman.
                  
                  ii)   At her own expense, Dr. Koffman shall participate in and
                        successfully complete, within 4 months of the date of this Order,
                        individualized instruction with respect to OHIP billing with an
                        instructor approved by the College.  The instructor shall provide a
                        summative report to the College including his or her conclusion
                        about whether the instruction was completed successfully by Dr.
                        Koffman.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Aug 2017
Summary:

On August 15, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Koffman committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that she has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
  
Dr. Koffman is a family physician who received her certificate of registration authorizing 
independent practice in June of 2000 and has been providing episodic walk-in care and primary 
care at the Earl Bales Walk-in Clinic since 2011.  Between January 2004 and December 2010, 
Dr. Koffman provided episodic walk-in care and primary care at the Bathurst Walk-in Clinic and 
Family practice. 
 
Unwanted Rostering 
 
The College received complaints from three patients about being rostered to Dr. Koffman’s 
practice without their knowledge and consent after they attended with Dr. Koffman at the Walk-
In Clinics and she requested them to complete “Patient Enrolment and Consent to Release 
Personal Health Information” form:  
 
   -  Patient A complained that when she first attended the Bathurst Walk-In Clinic, she 
      indicated on the Clinic registration form the name of her family physician. When several 
      months later Patient A visited the Clinic and was seen by Dr. Koffman, she was told by 
      Dr. Koffman that in order to make a referral to a specialist, she had to complete “Patient 
      Enrolment and Consent to Release Personal Health Information” form. Patient A was not 
      informed that by completing the form she would change her family physician to Dr. 
      Koffman. She had no intention to de-roster from her family physician’s practice when she 
      completed the form.  
   -  Patient B complained about being surprised and upset to find out that his care had been 
      switched from his family doctor to Dr. Koffman after he completed the “Patient 
      Enrolment and Consent to Release Personal Health Information” form when being treated 
      by Dr. Koffman at the Earl Bales Walk-In Clinic. Patient B indicated in the clinic 
      registration form that he had a “previous” family physician.  
   -  Patient C received episodic care from physicians other than Dr. Koffman. When she 
      attended the Bathurst Walk-In Clinic and was treated by Dr. Koffman, Dr. Koffman 
      requested her to sign a Patient Enrollment Form. Patient C did not understand that in 
      doing so she would be rostered to Dr. Koffman’s practice and found out that she was 
      listed as Dr. Koffman’s patient several years later, when she contacted the Ministry of 
      Health and Long Term Care. She indicated that it was stressful experience for her to have 
      been rostered without her knowledge and the subsequent need to undo the rostering. 
 
The College commenced an investigation of Dr. Koffman’s office practices, which revealed that 
Dr. Koffman engaged in inappropriate rostering with respect to an additional eleven (11) patients 
at the Bathurst Walk-In Clinic: 
 
   -  Patient E signed the Patient Enrollment form when she attended the Clinic with her 
      daughter Patient F who was an infant and was ill. Patient E was relatively new to Canada 
      at the time she signed the form, and already had a family physician. Patient E does not 
      recall whether the form was explained to her, stating that at that time she did not 
      understand the health care system and that she was willing to sign any form that would 
      help her daughter to get medical attention. When interviewed by the College, Patient E 
      expressed confusion about why she would be asked to sign a Patient Enrollment Form 
      when she already had a family physician. 
   -  Patient F signed a Patient Enrollment Form at the Clinic for herself and her daughter, 
      Patient G, while the remainder of the data in the form was completed by someone other 
      than herself. At the time she signed the form, Patient E had a family physician and her 
      daughter had a pediatrician. Patient F took her children to the Clinic when the children 
      needed to be seen quickly or when it was off-hours for her children’s pediatrician. She 
      indicated that had she known the purpose of the Patient Enrollment Form, she would not 
      have signed it. 
   -  Patient H does not recall any details related to completing the consent form for herself 
      and her son, Patient I, at the Clinic. The only item on the consent form in her handwriting 
      is her signature. At the time the form was signed, Patient H had a family physician and 
      her son, Patient I, had a pediatrician. Patient H had no intention of switching family 
      physicians or rostering with Dr. Koffman. Patients H and I only attended the Clinic when 
      their family physician was unavailable. 
   -  Patient J does not recall any details related to completing the consent form for herself and 
      her son, Patient K, at the Clinic. The only item on the consent form in her handwriting is 
      her signature. Patients J and K attended the Clinic when it was more convenient to do so 
      and saw Dr. Koffman only twice. Patient K recalls being asked at the Clinic if she had 
      intended to switch to another family physician when she had signed the consent form, but 
      she replied that she had not intended to roster with any physician other than her existing 
      family physician at the time. She was then provided with paperwork to de-roster from Dr. 
      Koffman’s practice, which she completed. 
   -  Patient L does not recall any details related to completing the consent form at the Clinic. 
      The only item on the consent form in her handwriting is her signature. Patient L did not 
      intend to switch doctors at the time the form was signed. She went to the Clinic on a few 
      occasions, when her doctor wasn’t available or she needed something urgently.  
   -  Patient M does not recognize the handwriting in the Patient Enrollment Form containing 
      her information and Dr. Koffman’s signature. She does not recall completing the consent 
      form at the Clinic. Patient M has had a family physician for over 20 years when the form 
      was signed and had no intention of changing to another family physician. She attends the 
      walk-in clinics only when it is convenient to do so and does not recall anybody at the 
      Clinic ever asking her to switch family physicians.  
   -  Patient N does not recall any details related to completing the consent form for herself 
      and her son, Patient O, at the Clinic. The only item on the consent form in her 
      handwriting is her signature. At the time the form was signed she has had a family 
      physician for 4 years and her son, Patient O, had a pediatrician for 11 years. Patient N 
      went to the Clinic only occasionally and had no intention of switching family physicians 
      for her son or herself. Given that Patient O had special needs, patient N wanted continuity 
      of care with her son’s pediatrician. 
 
On August 15, 2017, the Committee ordered and directed on the matter of penalty and costs that: 
 
- The Registrar suspend Dr. Koffman’s certificate of registration for a period of four (4) 
  months commencing at 12:01 a.m. on September 1, 2017. 
- the Registrar impose the following as a term, condition and limitation on Dr. Koffman’s 
  certificate of registration: 
    i) At her own expense, Dr. Koffman shall participate in and successfully complete, 
       within 4 months of the date of this Order, individualized instruction in medical ethics 
       with an instructor approved by the College. The instructor shall provide a summative 
       report to the College including his or her conclusion about whether the instruction 
       was completed successfully by Dr. Koffman. 
    ii) At her own expense, Dr. Koffman shall participate in and successfully complete, 
       within 4 months of the date of this Order, individualized instruction with respect to 
       OHIP billing with an instructor approved by the College. The instructor shall provide 
       a summative report to the College including his or her conclusion about whether the 
       instruction was completed successfully by Dr. Koffman. 
-  Dr. Koffman attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Koffman pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,500.00 within thirty (30) days of 
   the date this Order becomes final.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): August 15, 2017


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Jun 2003
Summary:

 On June 23, 2003, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Koffman to have committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that such conduct would be considered to be dishonourable, disgraceful 
 and unprofessional.  

On August 26, 2003, the Discipline Committeeordered and directed 
 that:

1.	Dr. Koffman be required to appear before the Panel to be reprimanded and that the fact 
 of the reprimand be recorded on the register.
2.	The Registrar shall suspend Dr. Koffman(s 
 certificate of registration for a period of three months, the date of commencement of which is to 
 be fixed by the Registrar.
3.	The Registrar shall impose on Dr. Koffman(s certificate of 
 registration the term, condition and limitation that she successfully complete at her own expense 
 a course on boundaries approved by the College within twelve months, and provide to the Registrar 
 satisfactory proof that she has done so.
4.	The Registrar shall impose on Dr. Koffman(s 
 certificate of registration the further term, condition, and limitation that she is not to provide 
 any services billable to  OHIP as psychotherapy, unless the following criteria are met:
(i)	That 
 she be enrolled in, participate in and successfully complete at her own expense within eighteen 
 months a basic skills in psychotherapy curriculum satisfactory to the Registrar, and provide to 
 the Registrar satisfactory proof that she has done so.
(ii)	That she co-operate in a monthly 
 review of her psychotherapy practice by a qualified supervisor acceptable to the Registrar, with 
 quarterly reports to the Registrar, which shall include approval of the acceptability of the 
 practice milieu.  Compensation of the supervisor will be the responsibility of Dr. Koffman.  
 Removal of this condition shall be on the recommendation of the Quality Assurance Committee to the 
 Registrar following a satisfactory review and assessment at Dr. Koffman(s expense after two 
 years.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 10, 2003