Kogan, Irina (CPSO#: 71497)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: Povetkina, Irina (used until: 05 Nov 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Rostovskij Medicinskij Institut, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 2005