Kohari, Joseph (CPSO#: 17273)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1998

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Franz Joseph University of Kolozsvar, 1937

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Aug 1981
Summary:

 In August 1981, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Kohari guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 34(3)(c) of the Medical Act, 1970, as amended, in that he had been guilty of 
 misconduct in a professional respect or of conduct unbecoming a medical practitioner or of 
 incompetence.  The Committee further found Dr. Kohari guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 26(31) of Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an 
 act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  Consequently, 
 the Committee ordered that Dr. Kohari's licence to practice be suspended for a period of twelve 
 months, but that the imposition of this penalty was itself to be suspended.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 29 Apr 1983
Hearing Date(s): 10 Aug 1981