Kohen, Samuel Abuaf (CPSO#: 92209)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Oct 2009 to 02 Nov 2009
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2017