Kohli-Dang, Neeta (CPSO#: 50984)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: Kohli, Neeta (used until: 16 Apr 1984 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 11 Sep 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 2007