Kohn, Magdie Leah (CPSO#: 74064)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 216
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone: (905) 456-3699 Ext. 26
Fax: (905) 456-8768
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

820 River Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5K4
Canada
Phone: (807) 683-441
Fax: (807) 683-4420
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Toronto Sleep Institute - Thornhill
Suite 208
390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 709-9696
Fax: (905) 709-9764
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Kohn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kohn ( CPSO# 74064 )

Business Address:
Suite 216
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone Number: (905) 709-9696

Business Address:
Toronto Sleep Institute - Thornhill
Suite 208
390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 709-9696

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 14 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAGDIE LEAH KOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOHN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003