Koifman, Nimrod Kalman (CPSO#: 33391)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1A
6758 Kingston Road
Toronto ON  M1B 1G8
Phone: (416) 286-7890
Fax: (416) 286-8600
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centenary Health Centre
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Koifman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Koifman ( CPSO# 33391 )

Business Address:
Unit 1A
6758 Kingston Road
Toronto ON  M1B 1G8
Phone Number: (416) 286-7890

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIMROD KALMAN KOIFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOIFMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1982