Koivu, Sharon Louise (CPSO#: 54102)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Names: Baker, Sharon Louise (used until: 11 Apr 2013 )     Hertwig, Sharon Louise (used until: 18 Feb 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 36869
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon L. Koivu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Koivu ( CPSO# 54102 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON LOUISE KOIVU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOIVU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1985