Koka, Hanumantha Rayudu (CPSO#: 57715)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: Koka, Koka Hanumantha (used until: 18 Sep 1989 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:Karnatak University Dharwar, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Kirkwood Site
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone: (705) 675-5900 Ext. 8234
Fax: (705) 671-3031
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Rayudu Koka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Koka ( CPSO# 57715 )

Business Address:
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone Number: (705) 675-5900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
North Shore Health Network Blind River
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANUMANTHA RAYUDU KOKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOKA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1990