Koka, Suman Kumar (CPSO#: 88116)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
80 elm st
Sudbury ON  P3C 1T2
Phone: (705) 522-3737
Fax: 705 806-7915
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2009 Long Lake Rd.
Suite 101
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Canada
Phone: (705) 522-5447
Fax: (705) 522-1797
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

41 Ramsay Lake Rd.
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

181 Elm St.
Sudbury ON  P3C 1T8
Canada
Phone: (705) 564-4150 Ext. 218
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

333 York st.
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J3
Canada
Phone: (705) 674-4221
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

18 Hills Trail
Wikwemikong ON  P0P2J0
Canada
Phone: (705) 8593280
Fax: 7058593205
County: Territorial District of Manitoulin
Electoral District: 08

93 Notre Dame Avenue West
Azilda ON  P0M 1B0
Canada
Phone: (705) 805-6074
Fax: 7058056076
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

51 kokoko rd.
Massey ON  P0P1P0
Canada
Phone: 7058440523
Fax: 7058442844
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

23 Shingwauk St
Garden River ON  P6A7B2
Canada
Phone: 7059465710
Fax: 7059465702
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

123 March st.
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2Z5
Canada
Phone: (705) 256-8925
Fax: (705) 256-1266
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

2066 Chiefswood Rd.
Brantford ON  N0A 1M0
Canada
Phone: 519-968-0951
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Suman Koka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Koka ( CPSO# 88116 )

Business Address:
18 Hills Trail
Wikwemikong ON  P0P 2J0

Business Address:
689A Old Highway 551
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1G0

Business Address:
23 Shingwauk Street
Garden River ON  P6A 7B2

Business Address:
1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Suite 102
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y8
Phone Number: (705) 560-2227

Business Address:
101 - 2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5H2
Phone Number: (705) 522-3380

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
181 Elm Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 1T8

Business Address:
80 Elm Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 1T2

Business Address:
503 - 123 March Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2Z5

Business Address:
368 Main Street
Haileybury ON  P0J 1K0

Business Address:
2066 Chiefswood Road
Ohsweken ON  N0A 1M0

Business Address:
40 Sugarbush Road
Thessalon ON  P0R 1L0

Business Address:
15 Meredith Street
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUMAN KUMAR KOKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 10 Mar 2008 to 01 Jun 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 02 Jun 2008 to 09 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 10 Mar 2009 to 09 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 May 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2011