Koke, Michael Jonathan (CPSO#: 68906)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 May 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital - Freeport
P O Box 9056
3570 King St E
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 7366
Fax: (519) 894-8323
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Oncology Program - Medical Day Care
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Canada
Phone: (519) 740-4940
Fax: (519) 740-7722
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Koke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Koke ( CPSO# 68906 )
Dr. S. Brickell ( CPSO# 68888 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital - Freeport
3570 King Street East
PO Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JONATHAN KOKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOKE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Care of the Elderly

University of Ottawa, 24 Aug 1999 to 23 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1998