Kolbasnik, Jeffrey Gennady (CPSO#: 68952)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
400 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Phone: (905) 693-1338
Fax: (905) 693-1351
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeff Kolbasnik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kolbasnik ( CPSO# 68952 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
400 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Phone Number: (905) 693-1338

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY GENNADY KOLBASNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLBASNIK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000