Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kolbe, Ralph James (CPSO#: 25324)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 20 Oct 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Mar 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1976
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Oct 1995