Kolber, Stanley Lyon (CPSO#: 25476)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, Ontario M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933-2904 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 09 May 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 25 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 1973
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2013