Kolchak, Andriy (CPSO#: 83466)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Odessa Medical University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
70 Colony Farm Road
Coquitlam BC  V3C5X9
Phone: (604) 524-7700 Ext. 337911

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDRIY KOLCHAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLCHAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 15 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 16 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2011