Kolenda, Jacek (CPSO#: 70593)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit B4
1148 Winston Churchill Boulevard
Oakville ON  L6J 0A3
Phone: (905) 849-7560
Fax: (289) 295-0113
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacek Kolenda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kolenda ( CPSO# 70593 )

Business Address:
Suite B4
1148 Winston Churchill Boulevard
Oakville ON  L6J 0A3
Phone Number: (905) 849-7560

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACEK KOLENDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLENDA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001