Koles, Sarah Louise (CPSO#: 74961)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: Waddock, Sarah Louise (used until: 24 Jan 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 25 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 2006