Kolesar, Richard Emil (CPSO#: 55774)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
General Division
Hamilton Health Sciences Corp
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-0271 Ext. 46698
Fax: (905) 577-8223
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Kolesar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kolesar ( CPSO# 55774 )

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
237 Barton Street East
General Division
Rosseau ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD EMIL KOLESAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLESAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1987