Kolesnichenko, Angela Patricia (CPSO#: 83369)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Instituto De Ciencias De La Salud, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
P O Box ICP 2500
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kolesnichenko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kolesnichenko ( CPSO# 83369 )

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
PO Box ICP 2500
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA PATRICIA KOLESNICHENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLESNICHENKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Aug 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2012