Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kolin, Arnost (CPSO#: 24912)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:University of Palacky, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Penthouse 5
720 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto ON  M4S 2N6
Phone: (416) 482-6194
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 13 Mar 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARNOST KOLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1972