Koll, Wayne Alan Leo (CPSO#: 66993)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Corp Oshawa Site
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 5441
Fax: (905) 721-6101
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

RMH, 10 Angeline St N
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3200
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

PRHC
one hospital drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 3032
Fax: (705) 876-5120
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Rouge Valley Health System
2867 ellesmere road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W Koll Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Koll ( CPSO# 66993 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7

Business Address:
PRHC - 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6

Business Address:
Rouge Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9

Business Address:
DRCC
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAYNE ALAN LEO KOLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1993