Kollek, Daniel (CPSO#: 57039)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1987

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 336-4116
Fax: (905) 336-6484
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Kollek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kollek ( CPSO# 57039 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
Emergency Department
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL KOLLEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLLEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1987

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)