Kolodziejczyk, Kazimierz Jan (CPSO#: 22215)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Nov 2000