Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kolyn, Donna Marie (CPSO#: 59578)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 1993

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2B
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J9
Phone: (519) 740-1625
Fax: (519) 740-0115
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Tri-city Colonsocopy
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Suite 200
Kitchener ON  N2P 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 650-2777
Fax: (519) 650-5577
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kolyn Klahsen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kolyn ( CPSO# 59578 )
Dr. A. Klahsen ( CPSO# 63657 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2333

Business Address:
Suite 2B
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J9
Phone Number: (519) 740-1625

Business Address:
Tri-City Colonoscopy
Suite 200
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener ON  N2P 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 650-2777


Corporation Name: Drs. Chan Flamand Kolyn Lee Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nguyen ( CPSO# 79450 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 77748 )
Dr. D. Kolyn ( CPSO# 59578 )
Dr. F. Flamand ( CPSO# 62734 )
Dr. E. Chan ( CPSO# 64970 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
745 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 0B6

Business Address:
Suite 2B
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J9

Business Address:
Suite 200
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener ON  N2P 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 650-2777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA MARIE KOLYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLYN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1993

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On December 23, 2016, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice, London, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Kolyn in respect of an incident that took place in December 2009.