Komenda, Paul Vincent James (CPSO#: 76186)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2006 to 28 Feb 2006
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2006