Komer, William Joseph (CPSO#: 55555)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health C
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone: (705) 549-3181
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Canada
Phone: (519) 464-4500 Ext. 5412
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William J. Komer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Komer ( CPSO# 55555 )

Business Address:
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone Number: (705) 549-3181

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM JOSEPH KOMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1986