Komorowski, Laurie Anne (CPSO#: 75112)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
268 Maiden Lane
St Marys ON  N4X 1B7
Phone: (519) 284-3450
Fax: (519) 284-4471
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. A. Komorowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Komorowski ( CPSO# 75112 )

Business Address:
268 Maiden Lane
St Marys ON  N4X 1B7
Phone Number: (519) 284-3450

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURIE ANNE KOMOROWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOMOROWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2002