Komvilaisak, Patcharee (CPSO#: 79550)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Khon Kaen University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 02 Sep 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 03 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2006