Konasiewicz, Stefan Joseph (CPSO#: 60999)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish, Ukrainian

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17215 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8E4
Phone: (905) 853-0404
Fax: (905) 853-3702
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10376 Yonge St
Suite 204-205
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C7
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-9797
Fax: (905) 883-3535
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

554 Main St. East
Hamilton ON  L8M-1J3
Canada
Phone: 905-527-5454
Fax: 905-529-4646
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stefan Konasiewicz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Konasiewicz ( CPSO# 60999 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 256-0600

Business Address:
Suite 204 - 205
10376 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C7
Phone Number: (905) 883-9797

Business Address:
10660 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Phone Number: (905) 770-9096

Business Address:
554 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1J3

Business Address:
17215 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8E4

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas
USA - Wisconsin

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 28 Aug 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEFAN JOSEPH KONASIEWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONASIEWICZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Research Fellows - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1990