Koncan, Julie Helene (CPSO#: 102994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: Emond, Julie Helene (used until: 02 Dec 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre Médical St-Isidore
4553 rue Ste-Catherine
St Isidore ON  K0C 2B0
Phone: (613) 524-3225
Fax: (613) 524-2513
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE HELENE KONCAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONCAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016