Kondor, Natalie Maria (CPSO#: 81158)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
34 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3J7
Phone: (613) 5496666 Ext. 6204
Fax: (613) 548-1316
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

34 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3J7
Canada
Phone: (613) 548-3232 Ext. 6204
Fax: (613) 548-1316
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Kondor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kondor ( CPSO# 81158 )

Business Address:
34 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3J7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE MARIA KONDOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONDOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 May 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jun 2007 to 31 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2007