Kong, Kester (CPSO#: 63097)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 754-1554
Fax: (416) 754-1559
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kester Kong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kong ( CPSO# 63097 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 754-1554

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 23 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KESTER KONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1991