Kong, Waitak (CPSO#: 65253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
N 2 916
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-6221
Fax: (905) 494-6717
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAITAK KONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993