Konieczny, Karen Marta (CPSO#: 91259)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dixie Medical Group
113-1055 Canadian Place
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Phone: 905-212-9600
Fax: 905-212-9620
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Michael's Hospital
Suite 6-050 Donnelly Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416-864-5104
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Ontario Heart Center
100 Humber College Blvd, Suite 207
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Canada
Phone: 1-877-872-4477
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN MARTA KONIECZNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONIECZNY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2014