Konieczny, Stanislaw Jan (CPSO#: 54175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Bialystok University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STANISLAW JAN KONIECZNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONIECZNY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1987