Konn, George (CPSO#: 50735)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Professional Building
95 Bayly Street West
Suite 206
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 619-8778
Fax: (905) 619-8998
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Konn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Konn ( CPSO# 50735 )

Business Address:
Medical Professional Building
206 - 95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 619-8778

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE KONN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1985