Konstantatos, Spiros (CPSO#: 66669)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
855 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 3Z1
Phone: (416) 466-4828
Fax: (416) 466-5394
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Spiros Konstantatos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Konstantatos ( CPSO# 66669 )

Business Address:
855 Broadview Avenue
Suite 101
Toronto ON  M4K 3Z1
Phone Number: (416) 466-4828

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SPIROS KONSTANTATOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONSTANTATOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1995