Konstantinou, Chris (CPSO#: 61271)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:Ohio State University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 330
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone: (416) 461-5996
Fax: (416) 461-6479
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 11-14
398 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X3
Canada
Phone: (905) 881-0334
Fax: (905) 881-1721
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Suite 215
6633 Highway #7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7127
Fax: (905) 472-6534
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Ohio

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRIS KONSTANTINOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONSTANTINOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1990