Kontio, Ken Kalevi (CPSO#: 67816)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Finnish

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2426
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Kontio and G. Lalonde-Kontio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Lalonde-Kontio ( CPSO# 75311 )
Dr. K. Kontio ( CPSO# 67816 )

Business Address:
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-6133

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Room 3342
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
100 - 1385 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8N4
Phone Number: (613) 523-7440

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEN KALEVI KONTIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONTIO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999