Kontor, Jurgen Arthur (CPSO#: 22498)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Kontor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 26 2007

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jan 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007