Koo, Betty Kuen Kuen (CPSO#: 61534)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 446-7509
Fax: (416) 446-7509
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: P O Box 47613 Toronto ON M3C 3S7
Date Received: 11 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R
USA - Massachusetts
USA - Michigan
USA - Wisconsin

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 26 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BETTY KUEN KUEN KOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1993