Kooh, Sang Whay (CPSO#: 22829)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese, Korean

Education:Yonsei University, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 2000