Kooner, Sukhdev Singh (CPSO#: 43934)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Apr 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  April 21, 2011
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
NOTICE OF SUSPENSION OF PRIVILEGES: On April 25, 2011, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College that Dr. Sukhdev Singh Kooner’s privileges at Windsor Regional Hospital were suspended on an immediate and temporary basis, effective April 21, 2011.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1987
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 15 Nov 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2002
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 28 Nov 2008
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 05 Jan 2009
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 04 Apr 2009
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 05 Dec 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 2015

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 01 Aug 2008
Summary:

 On August 1, 2008, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Kooner to have committed acts of  
 professional misconduct for failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and by 
 an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine, that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional.  In addition, the Committee also found Dr. Kooner to be incompetent in that his 
 care of a patient displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or judgement that demonstrates that he is 
 unfit to continue in practice or that his practice should be restricted.


On November 28, 2008, 
 the Discipline Committee ordered the following: 

1.	The Registrar suspend Dr. Kooner(s 
 certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months, commencing January 5, 2009.    
 

2.	The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Kooner(s 
 certificate of registration, as of the date of this Order:

(a) 	Dr. Kooner shall be prohibited 
 from practicing allergy medicine and alternative allergy medicine. This shall not be construed as 
 preventing Dr. Kooner from providing emergency care to a patient in an urgent situation. 

3. 	Dr. 
 Kooner pay costs to the College in the amount of $10,500 within thirty (30) days of the date of 
 this Order.

4.        The results of this proceeding to be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 15, 2007


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Jul 2001
Summary:

 On July 9, 2001, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Kooner guilty of professional misconduct 
 for failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Committee also found Dr. 
 Kooner to be incompetent in that his care of a patient displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or 
 judgement that demonstrates that he is unfit to continue in practice or that his practice should be 
 restricted. 

 On November 15, 2001 the Discipline Committee ordered the Registrar to revoke Dr. Kooner’s 
 certificate of registration effective immediately. 

 On December 12, 2001, Dr. Kooner appealed both the decision and the penalty decision of the 
 Discipline Committee to the Ontario Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court).   

 On December 27, 2001, a single judge of the Divisional Court granted Dr. Kooner’s motion to 
stay the penalty order on certain conditions.  

The Court ordered that the Discipline Committee order of November 15, 2001, revoking Dr. 
Kooner’s certificate of registration in Ontario is hereby stayed pending the appeal and on the 
following terms:  

1) That the appellant does not practice medicine in the area of allergy or any related field such as 
clinical ecology. He may practice in the areas of internal medicine and respirology only;  

2) That there be no indication on the appellants letterhead, business cards of any other 
documentation of his ability to practice in the area of allergy, clinical ecology or alternative 
medicine related to allergy;  

3) That the appellant cooperate with the College in setting up a plan of reasonable supervision 
for his practice as set out above;  

4) That the appellant comply with the recommendations made by specified physicians insofar as 
they apply to general office procedures and practice;  

On December 9, 2002, a panel of the Divisional Court granted Dr. Kooner’s appeal and remitted 
the matter to a new panel of the Discipline Committee on the condition that Dr. Kooner be 
restricted to practising medicine only in the fields of internal medicine and respirology and shall 
not practice in the area of allergy or any related field such as clinical ecology. The Court 
awarded Dr. Kooner $20,000 in costs and $7,688 in disbursements, plus GST.  

On December 24, 2002, the College filed notice to seek leave to appeal to the Court of Appeal 
the order of the Divisional Court. 

On March 14, 2003, the Court of Appeal granted leave to appeal.  

On November 5, 2003, the Court of Appeal dismissed the Colleges appeal with costs. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Decision Overruled
Appeal Decision Date: 09 Dec 2002
Hearing Date(s): 01 Nov 2000

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 16, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. SUKHDEV SINGH KOONER
(“Dr. Kooner”)

to

THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)


A. PREAMBLE

(1) I, Dr. Kooner, certificate of registration number 43934, am a member of the College.
The College has received information regarding my standard of practice.

(2) I, Dr. Kooner, acknowledge that the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (the
“ICRC”) referred allegations of professional misconduct to the Discipline Committee in a Notice
of Hearing dated December 4, 2013 and November 7, 2014 (the “Notice of Hearing”).

(3) I, Dr. Kooner, acknowledge that the ICRC suspended my certificate of registration by
Order dated December 2, 2014, under section 37 of the Health Professions Procedural Code (the
“Code”). I have commenced an Application for Judicial Review of the ICRC’s Order in the
Divisional Court by way of Notice of Application dated March 27, 2015 (Court File No 08/15).

(4) I, Dr. Kooner, acknowledge that I am currently the subject of an investigation bearing
File No 7214567 (the “Investigation”) by the College regarding whether I have maintained the
standard of practice of the profession and am incompetent, and whether I have breached the
terms, conditions and limitations on my certificate of registration (the “Investigation”).

(5) I, Dr. Kooner, acknowledge and agree that, in exchange for me providing an original
copy of this Undertaking as signed by me, and my consent to the dismissal of my Application for
Judicial Review, the College has agreed to withdraw the Notice of Hearing and take no further
action on the Investigation.

B. UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT

(6) I, Dr. Kooner, hereby resign from the College effective immediately (the “Effective
Date”)

(7) I, Dr. Kooner, hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration to practice
medicine in Ontario or any other Canadian jurisdiction after the Effective Date.

(8) I, Dr. Kooner, agree that in the event that the College should become aware that I am in
breach of this Undertaking including, but not limited to, becoming aware that I have either
applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a
certificate of registration, or equivalent, to practise medicine, the College shall, in its sole
discretion, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of
this undertaking, shall have the right to proceed with the specified allegations set out in the
Notice of Hearing dated December 4, 2013 and November 7, 2014, and shall have the right to
proceed with the Investigation it terminated as a result of this Undertaking and/or to proceed
with a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

(9) I, Dr. Kooner, hereby agree to bear the risk of any prejudice that the passage of time
might cause to my ability to make full answer and defence, and waive the right to seek any
remedy on the basis of the passage of time, should the College proceed with any allegations that
may arise as a result of a breach of this Undertaking and/or pursuant to paragraph (8) above.

(10) I, Dr. Kooner, undertake to the College to abide by the terms of the College’s Policy on
Practice Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an Extended
Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a copy of which is attached hereto
as Appendix A.

(11) I, Dr. Kooner, undertake to the College that upon signing this Undertaking, I shall
forward a request to the General Manager of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”) that
my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after I sign this undertaking and provide
a copy of the request to the College.

(12) I, Dr. Kooner, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees,
costs, charges, expenses, etc., if any, arising from the implementation of any of the terms of this
Undertaking.

(13) I, Dr. Kooner, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the terms and
conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(14) I, Dr. Kooner, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries
of OHIP and/or any person or institution who may have relevant information, in order for the
College to monitor my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking. I confirm I have executed
the form attached at Appendix “B” and provided a copy to the College.

(15) I, Dr. Kooner, consent to this undertaking being entered on the public register as
information that is available to the public.