Koop, Darryl Glen (CPSO#: 67606)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2003
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2016