Kopaniak, Marguerite Maria (CPSO#: 66693)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jan 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2077 Lake Shore Blvd W
Etobicoke ON  M8V 4C2
Phone: 647-722-2370
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Yukon

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGUERITE MARIA KOPANIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOPANIAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1996