Kopechanski, Lauren Astrid (CPSO#: 90503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southwest Middlesex Health Centre
22262 Mill Road RR 5
Mount Brydges ON  N0L 1W0
Phone: (519) 264-2800
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Services
Western University
Rm 11, UCC
1151 Richmond St.
London ON  N6A 3K7
Canada
Phone: (519) 661-3030
Fax: (519) 661-3380
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. A. Kopechanski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kopechanski ( CPSO# 90503 )

Business Address:
Southwest Middlesex Health Centre
22262 Mill Road RR5
Mount Brydges ON  N0L 1W0
Phone Number: (519) 264-2800

Business Address:
1151 Richmond Street
Room 11, UCC
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 661-3030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREN ASTRID KOPECHANSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOPECHANSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011