Kopka, Dana (CPSO#: 66288)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Slovak

Education:Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 211 9889 Markham Road Markham, ON L6E 0B5
Date Received: 01 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Feb 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 13 Apr 1994
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 14 Apr 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 13 Apr 1995
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 14 Apr 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 13 Apr 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 14 Apr 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 14 Apr 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 15 Apr 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Mar 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014